Trustees PAMOJA LEO
Charity number: 1162710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abel Okello | Chair | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Bowry-Blum | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Smith | Trustee | 23 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Rhodes | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HILL MSC | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA HARRIS-HILL BSC | Trustee | 16 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.