AFRICAN CARIBBEAN HERITAGE CENTRE

Charity number: 1165149
Charity reporting is overdue by 283 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 283 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 283 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 16 April 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 30 January 2018 336 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required