Financial history ZAMBIAN EDUCATION AND MEDICAL SUPPORT

Charity number: 1162951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £44.18k £39.10k £35.09k £34.95k £46.08k
Total expenditure £54.14k £27.12k £43.87k £30.24k £46.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A