RESCUING EUROPEAN ANIMALS IN NEED

Charity number: 1163203
Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Annual return 20 December 2019 08 February 2021 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2019 08 February 2021 111 days late Download
Annual return 20 December 2018 20 January 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2018 20 January 2020 92 days late Download
Annual return 20 December 2017 20 January 2020 457 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2017 20 January 2020 457 days late Download
Annual return 20 December 2016 20 January 2020 822 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2016 20 January 2020 822 days late Download