Trustees THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT GROUPS

Charity number: 1163152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Jones Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Dr Stephen Charles Allen Trustee 28 February 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE WITH ST BARTHOLOMEW, READING
Received: On time
Aidan Paul Adkins Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Ian George Nightingale Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Dr Francis Chinegwundoh Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
ROSHANI PERERA Trustee 17 March 2020
None on record
JACKIE MANTHORPE Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
Alphonso Archer Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record