FOREST OF DEAN ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forest of Dean Athletic Club offers athletic club training to anyone aged from 5 upwards, covering a wide range of athletic skills, using qualified, volunteer athletic coaches. Training is offered in a friendly atmosphere where everyone is encouraged to improve their skills, from complete beginner to serious competitor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 October 2015: Standard registration
- FODAC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Hawkins | Chair | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN ROBERTSON | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Ross-Collins | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Nelmes | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.33k | £8.76k | £13.10k | £14.99k | £11.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.99k | £10.71k | £10.99k | £12.44k | £16.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 406 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN THE FOREST OF DEAN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ATHLETICS AND RELATED DISCIPLINES INCLUDING TRACK AND FIELD, ATHLETICS, ROAD RUNNING, CROSS COUNTRY, TRAIL RUNNING AND RECREATIONAL JOGGING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 The Purples
Coalway
COLEFORD
Gloucestershire
GL16 7JL
- Phone:
- 01594562077
- Email:
- clubsecretary@fodac.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window