Financial history The Emily Davison Centre

Charity number: 1163951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.42k £0 £39.52k £139.76k £151.98k
Total expenditure £1.94k £1.89k £896 £69.69k £127.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £59.27k £127.66k