THE BENDER FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist charities whose aims include advancing the development, education, physical and/or mental health of persons under the age of 25 and to assist charities whose aims include promoting and protecting the physical and mental health of sufferers of cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 September 2015: Standard registration
- 09 July 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2018: Re-registered
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJAN BERRY | Chair | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hemingway | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BENDER | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.49k | £84.83k | £20.39k | £27.08k | £36.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.02k | £220.94k | £215.43k | £185.21k | £216.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 18 January 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/09/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN PARTICULAR BY: - PROVING ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY FUNDING ANY CHARITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM (AND, WHERE FUNDS ALLOW, TO CHARITIES THROUGHOUT ENGLAND) WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE DEVELOPMENT, EDUCATION, PHYSICAL HEALTH AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS; AND - PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO SUFFERERS OF CANCER BY FUNDING ANY CHARITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM (AND, WHERE FUNDS ALLOW, TO CHARITIES IN OTHER PARTS OF ENGLAND) WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND SAVING LIVES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CANCER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodfords Solicitors LLP
11 Harwood Road
LONDON
SW6 4QP
- Phone:
- 02077310750
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window