FRODSHAM YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1161985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Roy Wintle Trustee 03 June 2019 None on record
Dawn Margaret Oultram Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Sarah Alice Mills Trustee 15 July 2019 None on record
Eve Charlotte Dougherty Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
Andrea Brereton Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
Lionel Rimmer Trustee 01 June 2016 None on record
Liam Jones Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record