Accounts and annual returns WEST WICKHAM AND SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1166796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 December 2017 42 days late Download Open in new window