Financial history WEST WICKHAM AND SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1166796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £2.33m £299.70k £203.14k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £113.19k £230.45k £207.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £175.45k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £9.24k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £10.56k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £2.13m N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £78.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £113.19k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £600 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £7.60k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A