Trustees 1ST HALTON SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 506376

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Laurence Woodward | Chair | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Saunders | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Woodward | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Culshaw | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Brocklehurst | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Nicholson | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ian Cummings | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah O'Connell | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
EMMA CUMMINGS | Trustee | 15 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
COLIN GEORGE EGERTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.