VIZSLA RESCUE

Charity number: 1162862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emily Charlotte Waddell Trustee 17 September 2017 None on record
Dianne Louise Coupland Trustee 07 October 2018 None on record
GRANT BAKER Trustee 27 July 2015 None on record
Claire Dawn Oliver Trustee 17 September 2017 None on record
SYLVIA MARSHALL Chair 20 May 2015 None on record
AMANDA JANE ROCHE Trustee 20 May 2015 None on record
NATASCHA DOBROVITS Trustee 28 July 2015 None on record