LIGHTHOUSE MANSFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lighthouse Mansfield is a Christian charity that runs activites and events for children and young people during school Holidays and also periodically throughtout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 December 2015: Standard registration
- LHM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heidi Rebecca Balajadia | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Walters | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christorpher Lee | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tetley | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Grice | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2018 | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.32k | £8.83k | £1.38k | £46 | £1.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.85k | £10.05k | £2.13k | £61 | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 255 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 255 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 07 August 2024 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL HOLIDAY WEEK FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF MANSFIELD,NOTTINGHAM, WITH ACTIVITIES IN A COMBINATION OF PERFORMING ARTS, TEACHING, MUSIC, AND HANDICRAFTS DELIVERED IN WAYS WHICH ADVANCE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ITS VALUES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 CHERITON CLOSE
MANSFIELD
NG19 6ED
- Phone:
- 07903086222
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window