FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S WINKFIELD

Charity number: 1162342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time Download