FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S WINKFIELD

Charity number: 1162342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.77k £11.36k £12.59k £7.78k £2.31k
Total expenditure £1.26k £2.52k £6.04k £21.08k £2.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A