Financial history THE SIGNAL BOX CENTRE

Charity number: 1163454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £17.87k £20.79k £22.25k £13.43k £4.64k
Total expenditure £14.31k £17.67k £17.79k £17.70k £17.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £900 £750 £322 N/A N/A