Financial history COMMUNITY IRON

Charity number: 1162930
Charity reporting is up to date (161 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £127.12k £114.87k £120.82k £119.91k £136.17k
Total expenditure £126.26k £127.14k £111.04k £126.12k £140.87k
Income from government contracts N/A £12.00k N/A £20.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A