Financial history MUSIC IN OUR BONES

Charity number: 1166578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.64k £40.97k £48.80k £40.71k £33.21k
Total expenditure £27.89k £39.62k £36.78k £41.89k £36.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.60k £12.76k £5.68k £1.76k £14.27k