Trustees MUSIC IN OUR BONES

Charity number: 1166578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN HEYWOOD Chair 18 April 2016
None on record
Adrian Stannard-Smith Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Judith Goldsmith Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Allan Williams Trustee 15 March 2017
None on record
PAMELA WAGSTAFF Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
IAN FLOWER Trustee 01 July 2007
None on record
ELIZABETH GERRIE Trustee 01 July 2007
None on record
OLIVER KNOWLAND Trustee 01 July 2007
None on record