THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BROADSTONE, POOLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ANGLICAN CHURCH OFFERING PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PRAYER, TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY, MISSION AND OUTREACH. OPEN TO ALL. PROVIDES PASTORAL CARE FOR THE CONGREGATION AND WIDER COMMUNITY AND SUPPORTS CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 12 June 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST. JOHN'S CHURCH, BROADSTONE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynette Rosalind Winsworth | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Diane Phillips | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Peta Hoar | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Louisa Dimmock | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Griffin | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Wilson | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Green | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ridd | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Isabel Willford | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Leach | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather McGregor-Wright | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS IAN HECKFORD | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Sharp | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Winsworth | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline McGregor-Wright | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev HELEN BAILEY | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY JONES | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MANSTON | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.03k | £107.97k | £178.71k | £293.46k | £239.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.13k | £135.54k | £187.63k | £623.45k | £842.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARISH OFFICE
OF ST JOHN'S CHURCH
DUNYEATS ROAD
BROADSTONE
BH18 8AQ
- Phone:
- 01202697641
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window