Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BROADSTONE, POOLE
Charity number: 1162162

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Leach | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Isabel Willford | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS IAN HECKFORD | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather McGregor-Wright | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bennett | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Mortimer | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Winsworth | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Sharp | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Foulger | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Campbell Miller | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline McGregor-Wright | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thornton | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Cullen | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev HELEN BAILEY | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MANSTON | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GERALD MELLERS | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eric Whapples | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY JONES | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.