FLEETWOOD SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH SERVICES, SUMMER/CHRISTMAS FAYRES. SPIRITUAL CHURCH SERVICES. CHILDREN'S CHRISTMAS AND HALLOWEEN PARTYS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR HOUGH SHAW | Chair | 23 March 1992 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Cornwell | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP THOMPSON | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN CHRISTOPHER HAGUE | Trustee | 22 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE MAUREEN HOLDEN | Trustee | 23 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CHRISTINE HATHERLEY | Trustee | 22 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
BETTY COWELL | Trustee | 22 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SHAW | Trustee | 24 March 1993 |
|
|
||||
VIOLET ANITA COMER | Trustee | 24 March 1985 |
|
|
||||
MURIEL RAINGER | Trustee | 21 March 1983 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.21k | £3.19k | £7.62k | £11.78k | £17.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.16k | £6.75k | £8.57k | £9.34k | £10.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 December 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SPIRITUALISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Halton Gardens
Cleveleys
FY5 2PX
- Phone:
- 01253273635
- Email:
- fwoodsnuchurch@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window