LUIGI & ESTHER LABONGO COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1162720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 February 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 February 2018 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 March 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required