LUIGI & ESTHER LABONGO COMMUNITY EDUCATIONAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1162720
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.67k £6.40k £8.70k £3.40k £0
Total expenditure £6.11k £6.32k £6.68k £3.40k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A