Trustees GATESHEAD INDOOR BOWLING CLUB
Charity number: 1164266

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Armstrong | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Lowdon | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Newton | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
John Stephenson | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gordon McAllister | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Brenda Diball | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE HACKETT | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.