THE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE, CARDIFF FACILITIES AND DEVELOPMENT FUND

Charity number: 506433
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED ON 16 MAY 1977 AS AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1982,AND 9 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE FACILITIES AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE STUDENTS ATHLETIC UNION OF UNIVERSITY COLLEGE, CARDIFF. B) TO PROVIDE THE FACILITIES AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE UNIVERSITY INDOOR RECREATION CENTRE.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 17 June 1977 : registered
  • 17 March 1992 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • THE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE, CARDIFF INDOOR RECREATION CENTRE FACILITIES AND DEVELOPMENT FUND (Previous name)
What the charity did
    No information available
Who the charity helped
    No information available
How the charity helped
    No information available