Financial history SICKIDS

Charity number: 1164131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.08k £13.87k £4.86k £4.53k £3.50k
Total expenditure £862 £8.32k £11.24k £2.50k £1.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A