HARBOROUGH TOWN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1163188
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £991.93k £128.60k £405.96k £659.16k £165.33k
Total expenditure £794.69k £186.67k £194.37k £294.98k £246.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £270.00k N/A £25.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £55.28k N/A N/A £83.80k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £81.51k N/A N/A £90.14k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £18 N/A N/A £103 N/A
Income - Other £855.12k N/A N/A £485.12k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £197.24k N/A N/A £270.77k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £20.72k N/A N/A £7.25k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £24.21k N/A