HARBOROUGH TOWN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1163188
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Scott Dougan Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Peter Dougan Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record
LAURENCE CHRISTOPHER JONES Chair 23 February 2015 None on record
Tomas Mikenas Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
SIOBHAN JUSTIN BREWIN Trustee 26 May 2015 None on record
ANDREW KEITH WINSTON Trustee 15 November 2015 None on record
Elaine Pepler Trustee 09 April 2018 None on record