THE ROYAL SOUTHAMPTON YACHT CLUB TRUST (RSYCT)

Charity number: 1164006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.09k £11.31k £18.13k £6.08k £4.10k
Total expenditure £4.90k £9.08k £10.95k £8.25k £4.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £450 £2.50k £2.50k £3.99k