THE ROYAL SOUTHAMPTON YACHT CLUB TRUST (RSYCT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT, IN PARTICULAR PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES INCLUDING THE REWARDING OF GRANTS TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN SAILING AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Southampton City
Governance
- 16 October 2015: CIO registration
- RSYCT (Working name)
- ROYAL SOUTHAMPTON YACHT CLUB TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Treasure | Trustee | 28 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Parry | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Jan Ellis | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Allan Beswick | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tina Daniel | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Captain Martin Phipps MBE | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £9.64k | £10.70k | £23.88k | £15.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.98k | £6.92k | £13.28k | £13.23k | £12.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT, IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND ASSISTANCE, INCLUDING THE AWARDING OF GRANTS, TO ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN SAILING AND ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Southampton Yacht Club
Gins Club House
Gins Lane
St Leonards
Beaulieu
Hampshir
- Phone:
- 02380223352
- Email:
- rsyc@rsyc.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window