ELVINGTON UNITED SPORTS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sporting, recreational and associated social activities for the people of Elvington and the surrounding area. This currently includes football, netball, cricket, tennis, yoga and dancing groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 June 1977: Standard registration
- LOWER DERWENT SPORTS & SOCIAL CLUB, ELVINGTON (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Wright | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nellis | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CHALLIS | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.97k | £18.63k | £22.62k | £24.10k | £10.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.95k | £11.68k | £8.98k | £11.49k | £8.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 276 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2023 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 August 2021 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 11 APRIL 1962
Charitable objects
A SPORTS CLUB FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ELVINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE AS A SPORTS FIELD AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ELVINGTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WHITE HOUSE GROVE
ELVINGTON
YORK
YO41 4AL
- Phone:
- 01904608143
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window