Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SUNNYHILL

Charity number: 1162354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 19 March 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required