Financial history FRIENDS OF SUNNYHILL

Charity number: 1162354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £2.29k £3.36k £1.50k £2.24k £0
Total expenditure £3.27k £2.19k £2.20k £571 £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A