MINNIE'S FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to help those in need by reason of their age, ill health, disability or financial hardship in the Borough of Charnwood. Minnies' Friends provides drop-in sessions and supports service users through: provision of hot drinks & food distribution of surplus food & clothing facilities to wash & dry clothes provision of showering facilities signposting & befriending services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Total income includes £32,413 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 29 July 2015: CIO registration
- 09 February 2017: Funds received from 1153473 MINNIES FRIENDS
- 10 October 2017: Funds transferred to
- 10 October 2017: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 18 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 18 May 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE BOROUGH OF CHARNWOOD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF DROP-IN SESSIONS, LISTENING SERVICES, A BEFRIENDING SERVICE AND SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE EFFECTS OF THE MISUSE OF SUBSTANCES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window