WORKSOP MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1164235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 11 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 10 March 2019 On time
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 08 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 12 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 02 March 2017 On time Download