WORKSOP MUSIC AND DRAMA FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1164235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £2.03k £4.17k £2.95k £4.44k £2.13k
Total expenditure £2.82k £3.47k £3.08k £3.19k £3.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A