KCG CARE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the provision of social accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 December 2015: CIO registration
- OCEAN HEART CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juned Malek | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SABA KHAN | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
THAVANESAN BALAKRISHNAN | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAJI KUNAM | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.23k | £11.51k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £60 | £8.47k | £540 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Dec 2015 as amended on 10 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION FOR STUDENTS OF THE JAFFNA MEDICAL COLLEGE SRI LANKA WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP''
Contact information
- Address:
-
98
Godstone Road
Kenley
CR8 5AB
- Phone:
- 02081098907
- Email:
- INFO@KCGCAREFOUNDATION.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window