ASHFORD PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ashford park primary school parents and teachers association. Raising funds to support our school and the children, their families and staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 08 July 2015: Standard registration
- APPS PTA (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lela Evans | Chair | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karen Collins | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Smith | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATIE BARELLA | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.75k | £26.63k | £39.76k | £20.67k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.55k | £18.84k | £34.12k | £36.19k | £10.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 693 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2023 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 April 2022 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 April 2022 | 647 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 April 2022 | 647 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHFORD PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL
STATION CRESCENT
ASHFORD
TW15 3HN
- Phone:
- 01784250305
- Email:
- appspta@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window