BURY INVOLVEMENT GROUP IN MENTAL HEALTH

Charity number: 1166584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download