Financial history 1066 SOCIETY CHARITY

Charity number: 1165028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A