Accounts and annual returns STRONG YOUNG MINDS

Charity number: 1164036
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 May 2021 On time
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 June 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 September 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 May 2017 On time