Accounts and annual returns NEPAL EARTHQUAKE RECOVERY FUND

Charity number: 1162850
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 July 2023 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 July 2023 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 July 2019 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 July 2019 10 days late Download Open in new window