Accounts and annual returns PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1164619
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 March 2023 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 March 2023 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window