GARDEN OF ABUNDANT LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE GENERAL ADVICE, EDUCATION, TRAININGS AND WORKSHOPS, VISIT TO HOSPITALS, SOCIAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES MAKING SMALL GRANTS AVAILABLE FOR INDIVIDUALS HOLDING SEMINARS AND CRUSADES YOUTH AND CHILDREN ACTIVITIES (FOOTBALL, CHOIR) ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH PROCLAMATION OF THE GOOD NEWS HERITAGE ACTIVITIES, CULTURAL MEETINGS, SEWING AND COOKING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Angola
- Cameroon
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 29 July 2015: Standard registration
- GOAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSASE LUBALOMO | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROMUALD KUSONIKA | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JOSEPH | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
BOLUMBU EKOMBOLO | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.51k | £18.20k | £12.88k | £13.91k | £13.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.51k | £18.03k | £10.21k | £12.20k | £13.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.49k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 April 2023 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF; 2. THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING THROUGHOUT LONDON EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 13
Hammond Court
Watermill Lane
LONDON
N18 1FA
- Phone:
- 07458998897
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window