2ND ATTENBOROUGH (ST MARYS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 05 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 25 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 01 August 2017 On time Download