2ND ATTENBOROUGH (ST MARYS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £8.49k £9.52k £16.42k £27.63k £4.49k
Total expenditure £8.13k £9.42k £18.01k £23.18k £4.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A