2ND ATTENBOROUGH (ST MARYS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR STEVE RIORDAN Chair 17 September 2015 None on record
Laura Armitage Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Craig Law Trustee 05 July 2021 None on record
Alistair Langton Trustee 24 February 2021
PASSION YOUTH PROJECT Received: 91 days late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ATTENBOROUGH. Received: On time
Katherine Phillips Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
ROBERT FREDERICK STORK Trustee None on record
CONOR MUSSON Trustee 23 November 2017 None on record
Stephen Rule Trustee 17 September 2015
LUCY AND VINCENT BROWN VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
colin barker Trustee 17 September 2015 None on record
timothy james orton Trustee 17 September 2015
SOUTH WEST NOTTINGHAMSHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
PHILIP MICHAEL MCCULLOUGH Trustee 23 November 2017 None on record
JOHN RUSSELL WHITEWAY BERRY Trustee
BROXTOWE YOUTH HOMELESSNESS Received: On time