Financial history UNIVERSITY OF BRIGHTON STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1164033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £3.52m £3.48m £2.98m £1.76m £2.26m
Total expenditure £3.60m £3.34m £3.43m £1.74m £2.21m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £141.27k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.58m £1.57m £1.71m £1.64m £1.54m
Income - Other trading activities £99.22k £97.32k £63.39k £35.07k £91.76k
Income - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.82m £1.21m £89.04k £620.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £624 £1.54k £1.83k £204 £81
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.56m £3.29m £3.40m £1.69m £2.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.87k £45.91k £38.30k £43.68k £80.27k
Expenditure - Governance £133.98k £109.46k £101.25k £15.87k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £18.20k